GB
Rajan Kumar Sehgal
Status:
Active
Notified: 01/06/2023
Nature of ControlSignificant influence or controlSignificant influence or control as trustSignificant influence or control as firm
Sehgal, Rajan Kumar
Status:
Active
Notified: 01/06/2023
Date of Birth: 09/1951
Nature of ControlSignificant influence or controlSignificant influence or control as trustSignificant influence or control as firm
Grewal, Balwant
Status:
Ceased
Notified: 04/04/2017
Ceased: 05/04/2018
Date of Birth: 03/1953
Nature of ControlRight to appoint and remove directors
Grewal, Balwant Singh
Status:
Ceased
Notified: 25/04/2022
Ceased: 01/06/2023
Date of Birth: 03/1935
Nature of ControlSignificant influence or controlSignificant influence or control as trustSignificant influence or control as firm
Johal, Jasbir Singh
Status:
Ceased
Notified: 05/04/2018
Ceased: 25/04/2022
Date of Birth: 01/1953
Nature of ControlRight to appoint and remove directors as trust
Grewal, Balwant Singh
Denham, Uxbridge, England
Status:
Active
Notified: 25/04/2022
Date of Birth: 03/1933
Occupation: Retired
Role: Director
Country of Residence: England
Nationality: British
Sehgal, Rajan Kumar
Rickmansworth, England
Status:
Active
Notified: 17/10/2022
Date of Birth: 09/1951
Occupation: Business Person
Role: Director
Country of Residence: United Kingdom
Nationality: British