Bain, Douglas Albert
Status:
Active
Notified: 06/04/2016
Date of Birth: 09/1951
Nature of ControlOwnership of shares – More than 25% but not more than 50%Ownership of voting rights - More than 25% but not more than 50%
Bain, Kristofer
Status:
Active
Notified: 30/01/2024
Date of Birth: 02/1991
Nature of ControlSignificant influence or control
Bain, Wilma
Status:
Ceased
Notified: 06/04/2016
Ceased: 18/06/2020
Date of Birth: 10/1954
Nature of ControlOwnership of shares – More than 25% but not more than 50%Ownership of voting rights - More than 25% but not more than 50%Right to appoint and remove directorsSignificant influence or control as firm
Bain, Kristofer
Station Road, Oldmeldrum, Inverurie
Status:
Active
Notified: 30/01/2024
Occupation: Company Director
Role: Director
Country of Residence: United Kingdom
Nationality: British
Bain, Douglas Albert
Station Road, Oldmeldrum, Inverurie
Status:
Ceased
Notified: 19/06/2020
Ceased: 02/02/2024
Date of Birth: 09/1951
Occupation: Bus Operator
Role: Director
Country of Residence: Scotland
Nationality: British
Bain, Douglas Albert
Station Road, Oldmeldrum, Inverurie
Status:
Ceased
Notified: 01/11/1999
Ceased: 02/02/2024
Occupation: Coach Operator
Role: Secretary
Nationality: British