Goss, Leland Harold
London, United Kingdom
Status:
Active
Notified: 01/07/2012
Date of Birth: 05/1958
Occupation: None
Role: Director
Country of Residence: England
Nationality: Irish
Jarratt, Georgina Claire
London, United Kingdom
Status:
Active
Notified: 05/09/2022
Date of Birth: 08/1969
Occupation: Md, Head Of Fintech And Digitalisation,
Role: Director
Country of Residence: England
Nationality: British
Kessler, Mario Christian
London, United Kingdom
Status:
Active
Notified: 09/05/2016
Date of Birth: 07/1980
Occupation: None
Role: Director
Country of Residence: Switzerland
Nationality: Swiss
Malvar, Alfonso
London, United Kingdom
Status:
Active
Notified: 08/01/2008
Date of Birth: 08/1967
Occupation: None
Role: Director
Country of Residence: England
Nationality: British
Pascoe, Bryan Gibson
London, United Kingdom
Status:
Active
Notified: 01/02/2022
Date of Birth: 11/1968
Occupation: Company Director
Role: Director
Country of Residence: United Kingdom
Nationality: British
Pfaff, Nicholas James William
London, United Kingdom
Status:
Active
Notified: 10/02/2022
Date of Birth: 04/1965
Occupation: Deputy Ceo, Head Of Sustainable Finance
Role: Director
Country of Residence: France
Nationality: American,French
Richards, Owen Paul
London, United Kingdom
Status:
Ceased
Notified: 08/01/2008
Ceased: 30/06/2024
Date of Birth: 03/1951
Occupation: None
Role: Director
Country of Residence: United Kingdom
Nationality: British