Hamilton, Mark Gordon Neil Hamish
Status:
Active
Notified: 06/04/2016
Date of Birth: 04/1966
Nature of ControlOwnership of shares – More than 25% but not more than 50%Ownership of voting rights - More than 25% but not more than 50%
Pizey, Simon Peter
Status:
Active
Notified: 06/04/2016
Date of Birth: 04/1962
Nature of ControlOwnership of shares – More than 25% but not more than 50%Ownership of voting rights - More than 25% but not more than 50%
Stewart, Ian
Status:
Active
Notified: 03/04/2024
Date of Birth: 01/1961
Nature of ControlOwnership of shares – More than 25% but not more than 50%Ownership of voting rights - More than 25% but not more than 50%
Stewart, Gae Violet
Status:
Ceased
Notified: 06/04/2016
Ceased: 03/04/2024
Date of Birth: 12/1937
Nature of ControlOwnership of shares – More than 25% but not more than 50%Ownership of voting rights - More than 25% but not more than 50%
Gordon, Dorcas
London
Status:
Active
Notified: 01/04/2022
Role: Secretary
Hamilton, Mark Gordon Neil Hamish
London
Status:
Active
Notified: 09/03/2011
Date of Birth: 04/1966
Occupation: None
Role: Director
Country of Residence: United Kingdom
Nationality: British
Pizey, Simon Peter
London, United Kingdom
Status:
Active
Notified: 07/10/2011
Date of Birth: 04/1962
Occupation: Director
Role: Director
Country of Residence: United Kingdom
Nationality: British
Stewart, Ian Duncan
London
Status:
Active
Notified: 09/03/2011
Date of Birth: 11/1961
Occupation: None
Role: Director
Country of Residence: United States
Nationality: New Zealander