Johnson, Robert Neil
London, England
Status:
Active
Notified: 20/07/2015
Date of Birth: 11/1955
Occupation: Director
Role: Director
Country of Residence: England
Nationality: British
Khan, Anjum
London, England
Status:
Active
Notified: 22/07/2015
Date of Birth: 12/1975
Occupation: Company Director
Role: Director
Country of Residence: England
Nationality: British
Perez, Alejandro Cao
London, England
Status:
Active
Notified: 22/07/2015
Date of Birth: 09/1974
Occupation: Company Director
Role: Director
Country of Residence: England
Nationality: British
Rogers, Darren
London, England
Status:
Active
Notified: 20/07/2015
Role: Secretary
Apsey, Rudd
London, England
Status:
Ceased
Notified: 23/11/2016
Ceased: 15/09/2024
Date of Birth: 02/1960
Occupation: Business Development
Role: Director
Country of Residence: England
Nationality: British