Bodner, Sandra Yvonne
Status:
Active
Notified: 13/02/2018
Date of Birth: 01/1942
Nature of ControlSignificant influence or control
Bodner, Harold
Status:
Ceased
Notified: 20/07/2016
Ceased: 11/01/2018
Date of Birth: 03/1937
Nature of ControlOwnership of shares – More than 25% but not more than 50%Ownership of voting rights - More than 25% but not more than 50%
Alderton, Norman David
Cuffley, Hertfordshire
Status:
Active
Notified: 24/05/2006
Date of Birth: 07/1947
Occupation: Underwriter
Role: Director
Country of Residence: England
Nationality: British
Bodner, Sandra Yvonne
Cuffley, Potters Bar, Hertfordshire, England
Status:
Active
Notified: 01/08/2014
Role: Secretary
Featherstone, Marie
Goffs Oak, Waltham Cross, Hertfordshire, England
Status:
Active
Notified: 30/06/2015
Date of Birth: 06/1948
Occupation: Homemaker
Role: Director
Country of Residence: United Kingdom
Nationality: British
Moretto, Vito
Cuffley, Hertfordshire
Status:
Active
Notified: 28/02/2007
Date of Birth: 09/1940
Occupation: Retired
Role: Director
Country of Residence: England
Nationality: Italian
Qavolli, Denis
Cuffley, Potters Bar, England
Status:
Active
Notified: 20/02/2020
Date of Birth: 01/1977
Occupation: Chauffeur
Role: Director
Country of Residence: England
Nationality: British
Warren, Brian
Cuffley, Potters Bar, Hertfordshire
Status:
Active
Notified: 24/12/1998
Date of Birth: 03/1935
Occupation: Retired
Role: Director
Country of Residence: England
Nationality: British