GB
Engcon Holdings Ab
Status:
Active
Notified: 04/09/2016
Nature of ControlOwnership of shares - 75% or moreOwnership of voting rights - 75% or more
Engstrom, Monica
Status:
Active
Notified: 04/09/2016
Date of Birth: 11/1958
Nature of ControlOwnership of shares – More than 25% but not more than 50%Ownership of voting rights - More than 25% but not more than 50%
Hunt, Robert
Status:
Ceased
Notified: 27/12/2017
Ceased: 23/01/2020
Date of Birth: 06/1955
Nature of ControlOwnership of shares – More than 25% but not more than 50%Ownership of voting rights - More than 25% but not more than 50%
Blomgren, Krister Bo
833 21, Stromsund, Sweden
Status:
Active
Notified: 28/01/2013
Date of Birth: 01/1967
Occupation: Director And Company Secretary
Role: Director
Country of Residence: Sweden
Nationality: Swedish
Blomgren, Krister Bo
833 21, Stromsund, Sweden
Status:
Active
Notified: 28/01/2013
Role: Secretary
Engstrom, Martin
Ashchurch, Tewkesbury, Gloucestershire, England
Status:
Active
Notified: 07/11/2022
Date of Birth: 09/1993
Occupation: Product Manager
Role: Director
Country of Residence: Sweden
Nationality: Swedish