Coleman, Mark Ronald
Status:
Active
Notified: 30/06/2019
Date of Birth: 01/1954
Nature of ControlOwnership of shares – More than 25% but not more than 50%
Coleman, Laurence Neil
Status:
Ceased
Notified: 27/01/2017
Ceased: 22/10/2019
Date of Birth: 10/1956
Nature of ControlSignificant influence or control
Coleman, Karen Jane
Eltham, London
Status:
Active
Notified: 30/10/2019
Date of Birth: 07/1959
Occupation: Teacher
Role: Director
Country of Residence: England
Nationality: British
Coleman, Mark Ronald
Eltham, London
Status:
Active
Notified: 30/06/2019
Date of Birth: 01/1954
Occupation: Retired
Role: Director
Country of Residence: England
Nationality: British
Coleman, Mark Ronald
Eltham, London
Status:
Active
Notified: 30/10/2019
Role: Secretary