Wells, Richard Philip
Status:
Active
Notified: 29/11/2019
Date of Birth: 08/1986
Nature of ControlOwnership of shares - 75% or moreOwnership of voting rights - 75% or moreRight to appoint and remove directors
Geoghegan, Nicholas Paul
Mayfair, London, England
Status:
Active
Notified: 12/05/2020
Date of Birth: 05/1959
Occupation: Director
Role: Director
Country of Residence: England
Nationality: British
Klouda, Louisa Alexandra
Mayfair, London, England
Status:
Active
Notified: 05/05/2021
Date of Birth: 10/1994
Occupation: Director
Role: Director
Country of Residence: United Kingdom
Nationality: British
Wells, Richard Philip
Mayfair, England
Status:
Ceased
Notified: 29/11/2019
Ceased: 19/09/2023
Date of Birth: 08/1986
Occupation: Director
Role: Director
Country of Residence: England
Nationality: British