Holland, Philip William Paul
Covent Garden, London, United Kingdom
Status:
Active
Notified: 01/12/2020
Date of Birth: 12/1981
Occupation: Director
Role: Director
Country of Residence: United Kingdom
Nationality: British
Naeff, Yorick
Covent Garden, London, United Kingdom
Status:
Active
Notified: 06/06/2019
Date of Birth: 06/1983
Occupation: Director
Role: Director
Country of Residence: United Kingdom
Nationality: Dutch
Pronk, Egbert
Covent Garden, London, United Kingdom
Status:
Active
Notified: 06/06/2019
Date of Birth: 02/1972
Occupation: Director
Role: Director
Country of Residence: Netherlands
Nationality: Dutch
Sebbata, Salim
Covent Garden, London, United Kingdom
Status:
Active
Notified: 20/09/2021
Date of Birth: 01/1971
Occupation: Company Director
Role: Director
Country of Residence: England
Nationality: German
Wennike, Helge
Crawford Street, London
Status:
Ceased
Notified: 22/10/1997
Ceased: 08/05/2002
Occupation: Investment Banker
Role: Director
Country of Residence: United Kingdom
Nationality: Danish