Dix, James Scott
Cambridge, Cambridgeshire, United Kingdom
Status:
Active
Notified: 22/03/2022
Date of Birth: 09/1980
Occupation: Director
Role: Director
Country of Residence: United Kingdom
Nationality: British
Stanton, Richard Barrington
Cambridge, Cambridgeshire, United Kingdom
Status:
Active
Notified: 16/09/2021
Date of Birth: 01/1964
Occupation: Director
Role: Director
Country of Residence: United Kingdom
Nationality: British
Stanton, William Robert
Cambridge, Cambridgeshire, United Kingdom
Status:
Active
Notified: 16/09/2021
Date of Birth: 05/1969
Occupation: Director
Role: Director
Country of Residence: United Kingdom
Nationality: British
Hanglin, Giles Spencer Ian
Cambridge, United Kingdom
Status:
Ceased
Notified: 01/12/2021
Ceased: 28/03/2024
Date of Birth: 06/1980
Occupation: Director
Role: Director
Country of Residence: England
Nationality: British
Plumb, Ian Colin
Cambridge, United Kingdom
Status:
Ceased
Notified: 16/09/2021
Ceased: 12/12/2022
Occupation: Director
Role: Director
Country of Residence: United Kingdom
Nationality: British