Rubin, Daniel James
Status:
Active
Notified: 07/09/2018
Date of Birth: 02/1979
Nature of ControlOwnership of shares - 75% or moreOwnership of voting rights - 75% or more
Cohen, Stanley Solomon
Status:
Ceased
Notified: 13/12/2016
Ceased: 07/09/2018
Date of Birth: 07/1926
Nature of ControlOwnership of shares – More than 50% but not more than 75%Ownership of voting rights - More than 50% but not more than 75%Right to appoint and remove directors
Hale, Robert
Borehamwood, England
Status:
Active
Notified: 05/12/2019
Date of Birth: 08/1943
Occupation: Director
Role: Director
Country of Residence: England
Nationality: British
Morpeth, Tony
Borehamwood, England
Status:
Active
Notified: 18/12/2014
Date of Birth: 09/1956
Occupation: Company Director
Role: Director
Country of Residence: England
Nationality: British
Partridge, Keith Brian
Borehamwood, England
Status:
Active
Notified: 04/09/2006
Date of Birth: 12/1968
Occupation: Accountant
Role: Secretary
Nationality: British
Rubin, Daniel James
Borehamwood, England
Status:
Active
Notified: 22/12/2005
Date of Birth: 02/1979
Occupation: Director
Role: Director
Country of Residence: England
Nationality: British
Rubin, Susan Lorraine
Borehamwood, England
Status:
Active
Notified: 05/12/2019
Date of Birth: 07/1957
Occupation: Director
Role: Director
Country of Residence: England
Nationality: British