Andrews, Paul Simon
London, England
Status:
Active
Notified: 14/02/2007
Date of Birth: 01/1970
Occupation: Infrastructure Developer
Role: Director
Country of Residence: England
Nationality: British
Blaney, Hugh Luke
London, England
Status:
Active
Notified: 19/12/2022
Date of Birth: 10/1963
Occupation: Investment Banker
Role: Director
Country of Residence: England
Nationality: Irish
Brown, Georgina Claire
Tewkesbury Business Park, Tewkesbury, England
Status:
Active
Notified: 06/09/2021
Role: Secretary
Cook, Allan Cameron
London, England
Status:
Active
Notified: 17/03/2008
Date of Birth: 05/1972
Occupation: Investment Banker
Role: Director
Country of Residence: United Kingdom
Nationality: British
Frost, Giles James
London, England
Status:
Active
Notified: 19/12/2022
Date of Birth: 10/1962
Occupation: Director
Role: Director
Country of Residence: England
Nationality: British
Nasir, Affan
London, England
Status:
Active
Notified: 21/03/2024
Occupation: Chief Financial Officer
Role: Director
Country of Residence: England
Nationality: British
Beaumont, Sarah Ann
London, England
Status:
Ceased
Notified: 20/02/2018
Ceased: 21/03/2024
Date of Birth: 05/1982
Occupation: Chartered Accountant
Role: Director
Country of Residence: England
Nationality: British