Camp, David John
St, Katherine`s Way, London
Status:
Active
Notified: 26/11/2010
Date of Birth: 08/1957
Occupation: Company Director
Role: Director
Country of Residence: United Kingdom
Nationality: British
Camp, Simon Clive
St, Katherine`s Way, London
Status:
Active
Notified: 26/11/2010
Date of Birth: 09/1967
Occupation: Company Director
Role: Director
Country of Residence: United Kingdom
Nationality: British
Nakamura, Tomoo
57-58 St James'S Street, London, United Kingdom
Status:
Active
Notified: 01/06/2020
Date of Birth: 07/1971
Occupation: Company Director
Role: Director
Country of Residence: United Kingdom
Nationality: Japanese
Pagan, Clare Noelle
St, Katherine`s Way, London
Status:
Active
Notified: 26/11/2010
Role: Secretary
Pagan, Clare Noelle
100, New Oxford Street, London, England
Status:
Active
Notified: 04/06/2020
Date of Birth: 12/1962
Occupation: Company Director
Role: Director
Country of Residence: England
Nationality: British
Laing, Ian Michael
London, United Kingdom
Status:
Ceased
Notified: 29/03/2011
Ceased: 12/07/2012
Occupation: Company Director
Role: Director
Country of Residence: England
Nationality: British