Bennett, Philip Edward
Nottingham, England
Status:
Active
Notified: 15/01/2018
Date of Birth: 12/1979
Occupation: Director
Role: Director
Country of Residence: United Kingdom
Nationality: British
Ellis, Duncan Bruce
Nottingham, England
Status:
Active
Notified: 27/07/2023
Date of Birth: 08/1977
Occupation: Director
Role: Director
Country of Residence: England
Nationality: British
Green, John Charles
Nottingham, England
Status:
Active
Notified: 03/10/2017
Date of Birth: 05/1967
Occupation: Investor Director
Role: Director
Country of Residence: United Kingdom
Nationality: British
Murray, David John
Nottingham, England
Status:
Active
Notified: 04/03/2022
Date of Birth: 06/1970
Occupation: Non Executive Director
Role: Director
Country of Residence: England
Nationality: British
Rothery, Grace Gemma
Nottingham, England
Status:
Active
Notified: 27/07/2023
Date of Birth: 09/1981
Occupation: Director
Role: Director
Country of Residence: England
Nationality: British
Slade, Jonathan Alexander
Nottingham, England
Status:
Active
Notified: 18/08/2017
Date of Birth: 08/1979
Occupation: Director
Role: Director
Country of Residence: United Kingdom
Nationality: British
Stevenson, Arran Jon
Nottingham, England
Status:
Active
Notified: 03/10/2017
Date of Birth: 12/1980
Occupation: Director
Role: Director
Country of Residence: England
Nationality: British
Vitty, Martyn John
Nottingham, England
Status:
Active
Notified: 04/03/2022
Date of Birth: 10/1975
Occupation: Company Director
Role: Director
Country of Residence: England
Nationality: British
Wright, Mark
Nottingham, England
Status:
Active
Notified: 03/10/2017
Date of Birth: 05/1970
Occupation: Director
Role: Director
Country of Residence: England
Nationality: British
Bains, David Jaswinder
Nottingham, England
Status:
Ceased
Notified: 03/10/2017
Ceased: 04/03/2022
Occupation: Investor Director
Role: Director
Country of Residence: United Kingdom
Nationality: British